ASTON ROWANT CE (C) PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising by parents and teachers to provide the school with additional resources. For the school year ending 31st August 2015 the school and PTA were fundraising for funds to build a Multi-Use Games Area (MUGA) and as such a significantly higher level of activity was undertaken. The main fundraising was through traditional PTA events although a very small amount came from external donors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Wilson | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.98k | £19.31k | £8.54k | £4.88k | £6.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.29k | £5.94k | £28.93k | £3.51k | £12.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 24 September 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 26 October 2022 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 26 October 2022 | 482 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 04 March 2022 | 611 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ASTON ROWANT CE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASTON ROWANT C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
SCHOOL LANE
ASTON ROWANT
WATLINGTON
OX49 5SU
- Phone:
- 01844351671
- Email:
- astonrowantpta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window