THE TRUST FOR THE PRESERVATION OF THE CHURCHES OF ST MARTINS (CHIPPING ONGAR) AND ST PETERS (SHELLEY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration, preservation, repair, maintenance, improvement, beautification and reconstruction of the churches of St Martin's, Chipping Ongar, and St Peter's, Shelley, and of the monuments, fittings, fixtures, stained glass, furniture, ornaments and chattels in these churches and their churchyards; and to do the same in the event of either church being declared redundant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 31 July 2002: Standard registration
- 18 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1 | £1 | £0 | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 28 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 16 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 04 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 26 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 21ST DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION MADE 23RD JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL THEREOF IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES NAMELY:- (A) FOR THE RESTORATION PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE CHURCHES OF ST. MARTINS (CHIPPING ONGAR) AND ST. PETERS (SHELLEY) ("THE CHURCHES") IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD AND THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AND OF THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCHES AND OF THE CHURCHYARDS BELONGING TO THE CHURCHES WHICH ARE THE RESPONSIBILITY OF THE CHURCHES; (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE SAID COUNTY OF ESSEX AND THE SAID DIOCESE TO PRESERVE REPAIR MAINTAIN IMPROVE BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE CHURCHES AS BUILDINGS OF HISTORICAL IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCHES BEING DECLARED REDUNDANT BY A PASTORAL SCHEME MADE UNDER THE PASTORAL MEASURE 1983 (OR ANY STATUTORY MODIFICATION OR RE-ENACTMENT THEREOF) OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCHES AND THE CHURCHYARDS/GROUNDS BELONGING THERETO. (PLEASE SEE COPY OF THE DEED ON FILE FOR DETAILS).
Area of benefit
ESSEX - CHIPPING - ONGAR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window