OPEN DOORS INTERNATIONAL LANGUAGE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open Doors provides the teaching of the English language to those who are disadvantaged, marginalised or isolated by language or culture. We run ESOL classes and vocational NVQ courses, employment mentoring and teacher training courses to qualify teachers to teach ESOL. Open Doors provides other workshops and activities seeking to help clients increase integration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£960,005
Donations and legacies | £2.29k | |
Charitable activities | £953.22k | |
Other trading activities | £2.31k | |
Investments | £2.19k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£960,749
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £959.03k | |
Other | £1.72k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £842,108 from 4 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.72k | |
Charitable expenditure | £959.03k |
People

43 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 01 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher William Hayter | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Wendy Tucker | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Phillips | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keresia Leann Kujinga | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Jonathan Collins | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Grace Screeton | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catalin Dobrisan | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irwin Buchanan | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £666.88k | £709.35k | £667.17k | £716.65k | £960.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £626.29k | £690.24k | £576.69k | £705.84k | £960.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £363.56k | £542.79k | £596.63k | £652.49k | £842.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £779 | £2.02k | £4.11k | £546 | £2.29k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.04k | £0 | £0 | £1.07k | £2.31k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £655.84k | £164.53k | £663.04k | £715.00k | £953.22k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £222 | £0 | £22 | £37 | £2.19k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £546 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £623.53k | £690.24k | £576.69k | £705.84k | £959.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.77k | £0 | £0 | £2.13k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.77k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.72k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.94k | £14.33k | £14.04k | £25.70k | £17.29k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £335.52k | £363.18k | £478.83k | £444.42k | £446.57k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.73k | £32.69k | £57.56k | £24.00k | £18.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE TEACHING OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE TO THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED, MARGINALISED AND ISOLATED BY LANGUAGE OR CULTURE IN PLYMOUTH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE SAID PLYMOUTH AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
N PLYMOUTH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-5 Manor Street
PLYMOUTH
PL1 1TL
- Phone:
- 01752258770
- Email:
- info@odils.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window