THE GOUT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides advocacy/advice/information
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Russell MAMRCPPhD | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry Tyndall | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alastair Dickson | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIM TAIT | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Emeritus GEORGE NUKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr KELSEY JORDAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALASTAIR HEPBURN BSCPHDMRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.35k | £8.30k | £1.69k | £6.22k | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63k | £3.85k | £2.87k | £3.94k | £5.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 11TH FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 29 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 27 MAY 2004.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE AFFECTED BY GOUT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 90
HINDHEAD
surrey
GU27 9FW
- Phone:
- 07778 304233
- Email:
- info@ukgoutsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window