THE VINE TRUST WALSALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We will work with hard to reach young people to fully equip them for life, so that together we will transform our community. A Community Development Trust that is actively engaged in economic, environmental and social regeneration. It runs an inclusive mix of services and facilities, which respond to the needs of the communities we serve, our Christian Ethos is behind all activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP BRIAN JAMES POWELL | Chair |
|
||||||||
David Lomax | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Reid | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Lorraine Johnson | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MARK HARLAND | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Jeremy Peter Sargent | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £768.37k | £584.84k | £149.62k | £66.80k | £71.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £563.19k | £280.35k | £103.95k | £118.90k | £116.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.70k | £72.48k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £85.04k | £93.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £266.48k | £70.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £106.66k | £56.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £310.19k | £363.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £563.19k | £280.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.65k | £7.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 September 2020 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 September 2020 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED ON 8 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 AUGUST 2002 AND 4 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONG WOMEN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF EITHER SEX, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION, TO RELIEVE THEIR POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS IRRESPECTIVE OF ETHNIC ORIGIN,GENDER OR RELIGIOUS BELIEF, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VINE TRUST
33 LOWER HALL LANE
WALSALL
WS1 1RR
- Phone:
- 01922621951
- Email:
- enquiries@thevinetrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window