DONCASTER ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of the public in Astronomy mainly in the Doncaster area. Give talks to school and community groups,at our observatory at Austerfield . Visit schools and community groups to further understanding in Astronomy. Hold regular public viewing evenings. Hold fortnightly talks on astronomy to which members of the public are invited.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 28 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN CADMAN | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Wood | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER LLOYD | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonny Wood | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £660 | £489 | £508 | £962 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £632 | £1.16k | £790 | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 2000. AMENDED BY ADOPTION OF GD3 ON 13 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ASTRONOMY AND ITS ASSOCIATED SCIENCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Westgate
Tickhill
DONCASTER
DN11 9NE
- Phone:
- 01302742550
- Email:
- treasurer@donastro.org.uk
- Website:
-
donastro.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window