CARING TOGETHER CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Under the names Carers Trust Cambridgeshire, Peterborough and Norfolk we provide information, emotional and practical support, training and breaks from caring for adult, young adult and young carers. We promote independence, support in emergencies and provide CQC regulated care for adults and children with special or complex needs. Personalised support is through clubs, groups or in family homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,944,200
Donations and legacies | £84.90k | |
Charitable activities | £3.83m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £16.00k | |
Other | £16.00k |
Total expenditure:
£3,955,400
Raising funds | £186.10k | |
Charitable activities | £3.77m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,598,000 from 6 government contract(s) and £259,590 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £186.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.77m |
People

123 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Peterborough City
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 April 2002: Standard registration
- 31 October 2012: Funds received from 1056026 CROSSROADS (CAMBRIDGE CITY) LIMITED
- CARING TOGETHER (Working name)
- CROSSROADS CARE CAMBRIDGESHIRE (Working name)
- WEST ANGLIA CROSSROADS (Working name)
- WEST ANGLIA CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Blake | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Scott | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Hepton | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Pisani | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bertone Santos Socorro | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina O'Connell | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donna Marie Talbot | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Mclellan Evans | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart Hipple | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Griffiths | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77m | £3.99m | £4.45m | £3.97m | £3.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.82m | £3.98m | £4.35m | £4.13m | £3.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.04m | £638.19k | £1.71m | £1.56m | £1.60m | |
|
Income from government grants | £667.18k | £358.20k | £324.90k | £320.00k | £259.59k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £104.10k | £76.30k | £71.20k | £96.30k | £84.90k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.66m | £3.81m | £4.36m | £3.86m | £3.83m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.24k | £1.60k | £1.40k | £400 | £16.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £105.00k | £15.30k | £10.80k | £16.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £21.00k | £19.60k | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.77m | £3.89m | £4.29m | £4.01m | £3.77m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £51.44k | £89.90k | £63.10k | £119.70k | £186.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £158.83k | £0 | £155.90k | £156.40k | £174.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £36.20k | £106.20k | £82.90k | £63.60k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £1.36m | £1.34m | £1.55m | £1.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £261.72k | £556.40k | £508.00k | £850.10k | £526.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 2002, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 JULY 2006, 12 SEPTEMBER 2007, 2 OCTOBER 2009 AND 27 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED 11/9/12 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 OCT 2018 as amended on 08 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- (A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASONS OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMPREHENSIVE SUPPORT SERVICES FOR CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH CARE NEEDS , PRINCIPALLY THROUGHOUT CAMBRIDGESHIRE, PETERBOROUGH AND NORFOLK AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES; AND (B) THE ASSISTANCE OF CARERS IN NEED INCLUDING BY RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES AFFECTING CARERS
Area of benefit
EAST OF ENGLAND, PRINCIPALLY THROUGHOUT CAMBRIDGESHIRE, PETERBOROUGH AND NORFOLK AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caring Together
LDH House
Parsons Green
ST. IVES
Cambridgeshire
PE27 4AA
- Phone:
- 01480499090
- Email:
- Accounts@caringtogether.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window