FORT AMHERST HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain, restore and preserve Fort Amherst and Lower Lines Park. To make the Fort and Lower Lines Park available as a public amenity and education facility. To provide benefit to the socially disadvantaged through training, education and work experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,900 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
210 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Medway
Governance
- FORT AMHERST HERITAGE PARK AND CAVERNS FORT AMHERST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Joseph Fowler | Chair | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ryan James Browring | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Moy | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Robert Bean | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kyle Rogers | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MOORMAN | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND GULVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.70k | £73.72k | £2.74m | £213.87k | £257.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.74k | £87.92k | £213.56k | £241.80k | £257.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £15.90k | £15.90k | £15.90k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.86k | £8.00k | £3.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £2.69m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £17.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £32.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £150 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £188.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £24.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 FEB 2021 as amended on 17 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
a) acquiring, restoring, maintaining, safeguarding and preserving the historical fortifications known as Fort Amherst and associated fortifications in the Borough of Medway in the County of Kent. b) To collect, care, conserve and display as appropriate, objects and documents relevant to the history of Fort Amherst, its associated fortifications and setting. c) Making the same available for research and for educational and recreational viewing and use by the public. d) Provide benefit to the socially disadvantaged through training, education and work experience associated with the objects above.
Area of benefit
MEDWAY, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fort Amherst Heritage Trust
Dock Road
Chatham
ME4 4UB
- Phone:
- 01634847747
- Email:
- admin@fortamherst.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window