LEIGH ON SEA ENDEAVOUR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ENDEAVOUR was built locally in 1926 as a Cockle boat and then spent most of her working life in Leigh-on-Sea. In 1940 she was one of the Little Ships that rescued troops from the beaches of Dunkirk. In 2001 the Trust was established to restore her, and, using Oak from nearby Belfairs Woods, she was relaunched in 2005, for community and educational use. She is moored in Leigh Creek.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 04 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ALEXANDER WEXHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carl Pullen | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Cameron McGregor | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Fraser Marshall | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY AUSTIN SQUIER | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE HANNAH LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID ATTLEE NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.93k | £8.62k | £5.10k | £7.95k | £12.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.38k | £20.81k | £4.47k | £4.86k | £4.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 September 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 July 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 30 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") (IN SOUTHEND-ON-SEA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, DISPLAY AND OPERATION OF THE COCKLE BOAT "ENDEAVOUR" WHICH RESCUED TROOPS FROM THE BEACHES AT DUNKIRK IN 1940".
Area of benefit
ESSEX - SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 07914209276
- Email:
- BALDYFRASER@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window