LONDON GAY MENS CHORUS (LGMC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The LGMC entertains, educates and inspires through song, performing an extensive repertoire to the highest standard. We believe that a diverse society is a strong society. We work with schools, community groups and individuals to share our vision; that all people, regardless of sexuality, gender, religion or race, are equal and deserve to be treated as such.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Gerard Brophy MBE | Chair | 17 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Nikhilesh Balfour Dasgupta | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Howard | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fry | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Sami Heath Qasem | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Suzanne Berry | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Haneman | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Maurice Weitzmann | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Jago Pierson DIXON | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cameron John McLeod | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Patrick Kaufman | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvie Pierce MBE | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.85k | £116.04k | £199.03k | £262.27k | £337.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.68k | £108.85k | £217.18k | £312.49k | £372.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 28 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAPITAL OFFICE
124 CITY ROAD
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07595075790
- Email:
- secretary@lgmc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window