THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH WEST PENNARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation for the public benefit of a building of special architectural and historic importance by the beatification preservation and maintenance of the fabric furnishings ornaments chattels and graveyard of the parish church of st nicholas west pennard
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD FRANK DIXON-WRIGHT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Johnson | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Wallace Norris | Trustee | 23 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR RICHARD HOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £1.81k | £2.17k | £6.88k | £3.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £2.50k | £61 | £85 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF A BUILDING OF SPECIAL ARCHITECTURAL AND HISTORIC IMPORTANCE BY THE BEAUTIFICATION PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC FURNISHINGS ORNAMENTS CHATTELS AND GRAVEYARD OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. NICHOLAS WEST PENNARD
Area of benefit
MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC FURNISHINGS ORNAMENTS CHATTELS AND GRAVEYARD OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. NICHOLAS WEST PENNARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Trevor House
Woodland House, Woodlands Road
Woodlands
Near Glastonbury
Somerset
BA6 8LQ
- Phone:
- 07812451024
- Email:
- jwnorris1@earthlink.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window