Financial history THE KENNETH ARMITAGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1092055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £78.93k £30.66k £44.36k £38.56k £42.08k
Total expenditure £77.44k £44.80k £47.82k £89.63k £126.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A