COCHLEAR IMPLANTED CHILDREN'S SUPPORT GROUP (CIC'S GROUP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives and activities of the Charity include the relief of needs of children who are deaf or have hearing impairment, in particular those who have or are considering cochlear implants and their families by the provision of advice, support and sponsoring research projects and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 May 2003: Standard registration
- CICS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS TRICIA KEMP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Monika Ursula Fines | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NEHA MEHTA | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela O'Donovan | Trustee | 13 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna-Marie Tuffs | Trustee | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Foster | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY CHIBUZO OGWO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.23k | £40.38k | £90.86k | £94.70k | £173.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.02k | £45.14k | £85.55k | £100.04k | £127.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 APRIL 2003, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 4 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED OF CHILDREN WHO ARE DEAF OR HAVE IMPAIRED HEARING IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO HAVE COCHLEAR IMPLANTS OR ARE CONSIDERING COCHLEAR IMPLANTS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND SPONSORING RESEARCH PROJECTS WHICH FURTHER THIS OBJECT; AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COCHLEAR IMPLANTED CHILDREN'S SUPPO
PO BOX 28843
LONDON
SW13 0WY
- Phone:
- 02088768605
- Email:
- info@cicsgroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window