THE WHOLE PERSON HEALTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Researching into whole person medicine, advancing education by the development and dissemination of the concept of whole person health care. Supporting such research and education. Creating a network of Christian Healthcare Organisations to develop whole-person health. Supplying Whole Person Care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 July 2003: Standard registration
- WHOLE PERSON HEALTH NETWORK (Working name)
- WHOLECARE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ROSS BRYSON | Chair | 23 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr Kirsty Marie Hannah | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Judith Helen Littlejohns | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Robert William Spiring | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr Louise Katherine Vaughan | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.57k | £16.46k | £38.43k | £6.04k | £12.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.60k | £19.59k | £13.52k | £12.64k | £32.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLE OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 4TH MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH BY THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF THE WHOLE PERSON IN THE EAST END OF LONDON AND THE CITY OF LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE DEVELOPMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF THE CONCEPT OF WHOLE PERSON HEALTH CARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mission Practice
208 Cambridge Heath Road
LONDON
E2 9LS
- Phone:
- 01214581711
- Email:
- admin@wholepersonhealth.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window