THE HIGH LANE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Educational, Recreational and Leisure Activities for retired and semi-retired people living in High Lane and the surrounding area. We have over 400 members. There are no obstacles to joining; no qualifications are needed and there are no exams. We try to meet the educational and social needs of our members whilst providing a safe and secure environment for the members to meet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stockport
Governance
- 22 March 2002: Standard registration
- THE HIGH LANE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Neillands | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Daphne Cooke | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Wareham | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Arnold | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dale | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
barbara kenneth | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andre Lister | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diane Saxon | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Birks | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Pam Curley | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Trevor Kinvig | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KENNETH | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GRACE HARLIN | Trustee | 09 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MCDERMOTT | Trustee | 13 February 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.79k | £9.80k | £82.66k | £81.99k | £94.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.60k | £7.73k | £82.53k | £79.74k | £95.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 13 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
HIGH LANE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Langdale Close
High Lane
Stockport
SK6 8JG
- Phone:
- 07736253446
- Email:
- HighLaneU3A@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window