NORTH EAST WINDHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a base for the community to meet and provide support and local resources. We deliver courses and activities that have been requested by the local users in conjunction with our many partnerships. We also provide an advice service. We have a Furniture store which provides low cost furniture. We have a creche where children can be cared for whilst their carer attends one of our courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £196,475 from 7 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 01 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Malcolm Hendry | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Robertson | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Haley Darwent | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gianfranco Sabelli | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KEELING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.97k | £461.65k | £353.57k | £378.84k | £464.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.74k | £415.32k | £367.88k | £411.58k | £485.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.08k | £78.04k | £77.34k | £199.40k | £196.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
05 February 2025 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 27 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY, PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NORTH EAST WINDHILL COMMUNITY IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE WINDHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED B Y THE CHARITY IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windhill Community Centre
Church Street
SHIPLEY
BD18 2NR
- Phone:
- 07407466260
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window