LIVERPOOL WORLD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education in issues of gobal development through the provision of services and through acting as an umbrella or resource body to provide education and training, and community development activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,150 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Joseph Kennedy | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Trixie Elizabeth Whittell Herring | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Bosibori Nyandoro | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mutsa Kamudzandu | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Richard Sawyer | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Johnson | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie May McAllister | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Doherty | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Bissex | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £332.75k | £474.37k | £191.40k | £153.49k | £196.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.22k | £501.32k | £195.66k | £250.06k | £163.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £43.65k | £10.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £266.71k | £103.32k | £64.94k | £23.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 31 DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ISSUES OF GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE LIVERPOOL AND MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liverpool World Centre
37-45 Windsor Street
Liverpool
L8 1XE
- Phone:
- 01517086515
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window