Accounts and annual returns THE ESSEX AND SOUTHEND SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1092238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 August 2024 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 06 August 2024 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 October 2023 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 17 October 2023 170 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 June 2022 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 June 2022 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window