THE ESSEX AND SOUTHEND SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Essex and Southend Sports Trust (EASST) provides charitable grants in support of sport in particular football, cricket and tennis. The geographical area in which it operates is the County of Essex including Southend-on-Sea and Thurrock and the London Boroughs of Havering, Redbridge, Barking and Dagenham, Newham and Waltham Forest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 28 May 2002: Standard registration
- EASST (Working name)
- THE ESSEX AND SOUTHEND CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Hampton Butler | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Pearse | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINLEY MARION BUTLER | Trustee | 01 October 2002 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH WILLIAM HENRY SIMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.55k | £214.96k | £238.36k | £288.12k | £295.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.05k | £162.62k | £166.41k | £401.97k | £249.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 October 2023 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 October 2023 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 June 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 June 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AND THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAVERING, REDBRIDGE AND DAGENHAM, NEWHAM AND WALTHAM FOREST (INCLUDING BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO THE UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF SOUTHEND-ON-SEA AND THURROCK )AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
AS DEFINED IN OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
RED HOUSE
LARKS LANE
GREAT WALTHAM
CHELMSFORD
CM3 1AD
- Phone:
- 01245360385
- Email:
- mail@easst.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window