PETER ADAMS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to a local residents with further education interests and activities etc, assisting local community village halls in different locations with refurbishment/improvement works, assisting finance for recreational local clubs with repairs to facilities, vouchers to pensioners within a parish, conservation works, assistance to a local Scout and Guide group etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 21 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN PAUL STRATFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA BRIGHTLING | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|||||
MARTIN JAMES PHIPPEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.32k | £272.72k | £298.24k | £304.69k | £300.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.04k | £197.46k | £210.80k | £290.84k | £216.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LOCAL EDUCATION, INCLUDING TRANSPORT, BOOKS, CLOTHING, FEES AND OTHER ITEMS AS THE SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DEEM APPROPRIATE. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PERSONS IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 3. TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS AND DISABILITY, INCLUDING GIFTS FOR HOMES AND IF THE TRUSTEES THINK IT APPROPRIATE OR DESIRABLE THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR SUFFERERS OR OF ACCOMMODATION OR SUBSIDISED ACCOMMODATION FOR NEEDY PERSONS WHO ARE OR WISH TO BE MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 4. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 5. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION. 6. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OR SUCH OTHER COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT. REFERENCE IN THIS CLAUSE TO LOCAL OR LOCAL COMMUNITY SHALL MEAN BETHERSDEN VILLAGE COMMUNITY, KENT OR SUCH OTHER COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BETHERSDEN, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE THORNE ESTATE OFFICE
FORGE HILL
BETHERSDEN
ASHFORD
KENT
TN26 3AF
- Phone:
- 01233820218
- Email:
- info@peteradamstrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window