THE BORZELLO TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 May 2002: Standard registration
- THE CAMDEN TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ANDREW BORZELLO | Chair | 07 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
ANNA BORZELLO | Trustee | 09 December 2009 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS BORZELLO | Trustee | 29 December 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £22.16k | £302.75k | £229.27k | £21.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.56k | £62.01k | £73.64k | £71.02k | £77.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AN IMPROVEMENT OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED INCLUDING: (1) PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE; (11) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES BY THE PROVISION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION OR TRAINING IN PROFESSIONS, VOCATIONS, INDUSTRIES, CRAFTS, TRADES OF THE SKILLS NEEDED IN EMPLOYMENT; (111) RELIEVING POVERTY AMONGST PEOPLE OF ALL AGES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE) AND ENCOURAGEMENT WHILST THEIR EDUCATION IS BEING ADVANCED AS AFORESAID OR WHILST THEY ARE IN THE PROCESS OF ESTABLISHING NEW BUSINESSES OR PREPARING FOR ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGING IN A PROFESSION, TRADE, CRAFT OF SERVICE; (1V) ARRANGING PERIODS OF VOLUNTARY WORK IN THE COMMUNITY; (V) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN UNDERSTANDING OF AND PRACTICAL ACTION IN SUPPORT OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENT. (B) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18A Camden Passage
LONDON
N1 8ED
- Phone:
- 02072264673
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window