INISHFREE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Residential rehabilitation for people recovering from drug and/or alcohol addiction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ross | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christina Burns | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Elizabeth Atkinson | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £508 | £73 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WHO ARE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF DRUG AND ALCOHOL ABUSE,THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE. 3. THE REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE. 4. THE RELIEF OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED AND PHYSICALLY DISABLED PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 School Road
EVESHAM
WR11 2PW
- Phone:
- 01453549931
- Email:
- PAULCADDLE@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window