Accounts and annual returns CMS COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICES RHONDDA CYNON TAFF

Charity number: 1102907
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 May 2010 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 06 May 2010 95 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 January 2010 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 18 January 2010 352 days late