THE COOKHAM FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a biennial arts festival in Cookham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
87 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 11 December 2002: Standard registration
- THE COOKHAM FESTIVAL (Working name)
- COOKHAM FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- TRINITY FESTIVAL COOKHAM (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK BOND | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE DIGGON | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £26.91k | £3.32k | £44.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.29k | £3.29k | £6.83k | £3.32k | £8.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 August 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 September 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED 08 JUNE 2005 AND 1 JUNE 2008. as amended on 09 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ORGANISING MUSIC FESTIVALS IN COOKHAM (IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD).
Area of benefit
COOKHAM (IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worcester Cottage
High Street
Cookham
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 9SQ
- Phone:
- 01628529573
- Email:
- dkb7@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window