Financial history THE ALBION (OXON) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1094372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.38k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k
Total expenditure £8.28k £10.65k £533 £3.50k £5.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A