Governing document KREATIVE CULTURE KLUB (KCK)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 08/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
A)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION PRIMARILY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AFRICAN/AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITIES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS, EDUCATION EMPLOYABILITY AND SPORT WITH AND AIM TO REDUCE POVERTY AND DEPRIVATION/DISTRESS. (B) TO PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATION THROUGH ARTS PROJECTS
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.