HELPING HANDS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping Hands offers advice, support, advocacy and practical help on any issue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £82,569 from 2 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL SWAN | Chair | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nazma Mulla | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ranjoth Singh Johal | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anita Baldwin | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Flinders | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Sumner | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Paul Watson | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND GREEN | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND LESLIE GRAYSON GILL | Trustee |
|
||||||
LESLEY THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.17k | £204.76k | £175.11k | £195.12k | £394.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.74k | £156.49k | £172.26k | £210.50k | £334.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £82.57k | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.18k | £202.26k | £86.22k | £83.57k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
1) TO ALLEVIATE HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE AREAS OF OADBY AND WIGSTON. II) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND TH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE ADVICE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND FOR ANY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TTHE AREAS OF OADBY AND WIGSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
50e Blaby Road
South Wigston
South Wigston
Leicester
LE18 4SD
- Phone:
- 07969959232
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window