FRIENDS OF ABBEYMEAD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Abbeymead Primary School (FAbS) bring together the whole school community, organising fundraising events and activities that help supply additional resources to enhance the school experience of its pupils and make school a better place for children to learn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 09 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katy Kear | Chair | 25 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Kirsten Cuffe | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kaye Harrison | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jaye Peacock | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Wright | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.11k | £7.74k | £7.29k | £16.75k | £19.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.29k | £6.80k | £3.18k | £15.28k | £20.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ABBEYMEAD PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbeymead Primary School
Mead Road
Abbeymead
Gloucester
GL4 5YS
- Phone:
- 01452 371710
- Email:
- Fabs@abbeymead.gloucs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window