PENTIDDY COMMUNITY WOODLAND GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE AIM WAS TO PLANT AND PROVIDE A WOODLAND BY THE LOCAL COMMUNITY FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. THIS IS ESPECIALLY FOR THE CHILDREN OF THE LOCAL VILLAGE WHO HELPED TO PLANT THE WOODLAND AND WILL SEE IT GROW IN THEIR LIFETIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 02 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannan Currah | Chair | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher White | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Powel | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Dodge | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sargent | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HAIMES | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS ELLE WATERS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GORDON PETER HAIMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANN MORSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/09/2019 | 28/09/2020 | 28/09/2021 | 28/09/2022 | 28/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £440 | £0 | £268 | £269 | £514 | |
|
Total expenditure | £172 | £332 | £256 | £256 | £185 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 September 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 September 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 September 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PENSILVA AND SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY WOODLAND AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF PENSILVA AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PENTIDDY WOODS
ATTWOOD LANE
PENSILVA
LISKEARD
PL14 5QU
- Phone:
- 01579363775
- Email:
- ELE@PENTIDDY.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window