Accounts and annual returns BOSCASTLE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1091662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 February 2025 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 February 2023 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required