PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ASSOCIATION (CENTRAL ENGLAND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main funtion of the PCSA(CE) is to raise public awareness concerning prostate cancer, support men and their loved ones through meetings, establish a number of small local support groups, campaign for effective screening and, where funds and circumstances allow, carry out free PSA (blood) tests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 2002: Standard registration
- PCSA(CE) (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garry Lamb | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maria Thompson | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Kemble | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Kemble | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Chapman | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Chapman | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER FABIAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.16k | £6.99k | £6.61k | £6.61k | £18.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.67k | £8.49k | £7.80k | £7.80k | £16.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 2002, 27 JUNE 2002, 28 APRIL 2005, 24 APRIL 2008 AND 29 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1) RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OR POVERTY OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER; 2) HELP AND SUPPORT PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER; 3) PROVIDE EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ABOUT PROSTATE CANCER TO PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 WINCHESTER DRIVE
BURBAGE
HINCKLEY
LE10 2BA
- Phone:
- 01455616283
- Email:
- bandscooley@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window