Financial history THE COMEDY TRUST

Charity Number: 1093264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £75.54k £73.13k £65.48k £57.39k £94.56k
Total expenditure £95.64k £57.66k £74.57k £82.67k £94.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.99k £22.79k £22.41k £34.83k £16.25k