THE COMEDY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Runs Community, Education and Mental Health and Wellbeing programmes throughout the year across Merseyside, NW England and the UK including the annual Liverpool Comedy Festival. The main focus is the ground breaking mental health and well-being programmes that aim to improve health and well-being, boost confidence, self-esteem and help to eradicate the stigma surrounding mental illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £16,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 August 2002: Standard registration
- THE LIVERPOOL COMEDY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN MILLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Freya Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie Caslin | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Lian Lavery | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin William Heywood | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain Duncan Christie | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.54k | £73.13k | £65.48k | £57.39k | £94.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.64k | £57.66k | £74.57k | £82.67k | £94.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.99k | £22.79k | £22.41k | £34.83k | £16.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF LIVERPOOL OF WORKSHOPS, CLASSES, DISCUSSION FORUMS AND WRITING COMPETITIONS FOR SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHERWISE IN THE ART OF COMIC WRITING, PERFORMANCE AND MOVEMENT WHETHER BY LIVE PERFORMANCE, RADIO,CINEMA, TELEVISION OR ANY OTHER RELATED MEDIA
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Court Theatre
1 Roe Street
Liverpool
L1 1HL
- Phone:
- 0151 702 5893
- Email:
- info@thecomedytrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window