OXFORD KILBURN YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Club-based, school-based and small group work, outreach and one-to-one mentoring across a wide range of interests and skills, as well as accommodation for volunteers from around the world. It is a place to help children, young people, families and those who work with them to live life to the full - socially & culturally, emotionally & mentally, physically & spiritually - both now and always.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
Governance
- 22 September 2003: Standard registration
- THE OK CLUB THE OXFORD KILBURN CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Mark Herbert | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Angela Buchanan | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Perry | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RUSSELL KINDER MA FCA | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Christine Kinder | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Turner | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.83k | £144.18k | £96.60k | £138.76k | £101.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.66k | £128.60k | £121.12k | £87.51k | £138.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.46k | £5.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED 15 DECEMBER 2002 AND 20 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY APPLYING THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE COMPANY WITHOUT DISTINCTION FOR OR TOWARDS ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 1 MAINTAINING ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN KILBURN; 2 ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THERE OR IN OTHER PLACES; 3 PROVIDING OFFICE AND RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR THE WARDENS CLUB LEADERS AND OTHER WORKERS FOR THE SAID ACTIVITIES WHETHER FULL TIME OR PART TIME WORKERS; AND 4 TRAINING AND INSTRUCTING PERSONS IN THE LEADERSHIP OF SUCH ACTIVITIES AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
KILBURN AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Denmark Road
South Kilburn
London
NW6 5BP
- Phone:
- 02076252520
- Email:
- operations@OKCLUB.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window