FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY, BLYTHBURGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation has continued to help in the maintenance of the fabric of Holy Trinity Church. No major repairs or large purchases have been made this year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 September 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Susan Powell | Chair | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Gerrard | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roselyn Crane | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence Alfred Goss | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MERYL FORRESTER DONEY | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.62k | £3.21k | £5.46k | £8.44k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41k | £95 | £203 | £668 | £1.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY MAINTAINING, REPAIRING, RENEWING, IMPROVING AND ENHANCING THE STRUCTURE AND FABRIC, FURNISHINGS, MEMORIALS AND FITTINGS (INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE DESCRIPTION FITTINGS' ANY ORGAN OR OTHER MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS OR STATUE WHICH MAY, FROM TIME TO TIME, BE WITHIN THE CHURCH AND INCLUSIVELY IN CONNECTION THEREWITH OF THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY TRINITY, BLYTHBURGH.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK - BLYTHBURGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Hart Cottage
Station Road
Blythburgh
HALESWORTH
Suffolk
IP19 9LH
- Phone:
- 07939325408
- Email:
- sgerrardnew@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window