THE MOUNT MORIAH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of hardship and suffering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
- Jordan
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 28 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY STEWART | Chair | 03 May 2002 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Spooner | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dennis Lovegrove | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Teideman | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Briggs | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATHY STEWART | Trustee | 03 May 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.97k | £172.56k | £201.47k | £171.57k | £209.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.39k | £147.46k | £213.19k | £155.04k | £221.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP AND SUFFERING AMONGST THE PEOPLE OF ISRAEL
Area of benefit
ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Maple Close
SANDHURST
Berks
- Phone:
- 01252879388
- Email:
- mount.moriah@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window