PEER EDUCATION PROGRAMME AGAINST AIDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and preserve the good health of people in the area of benefit through the provision of support for HIV and AIDS initiatives and the promotion of awareness of issues surrounding HIV/AIDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Zambia
Governance
- 19 July 2002: Standard registration
- 22 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- PEPAIDS (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.49k | £49.26k | £18.31k | £28.33k | £17.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.39k | £67.85k | £22.60k | £35.30k | £22.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 30 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 28 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 29 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN T HE AREA OF BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR HIV AND AIDS INITIATIVES AND THE PROMOTION OF AWARENESS OF ISSUES SURROUNDING HIV/AIDS.
Area of benefit
ZAMBIA , AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window