THE BUTTERFLY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A GENERAL PURPOSE CHARITY SET UP TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITIES ASSISTING SINGLE PARENTS, MEDICAL RESEARCH AND EDUCATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 2002: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 May 2012: Re-registered
- THE HAMILTON SCHRYER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD HAMILTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER HAMILTON | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18k | £1.87k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £1.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £1.00k | £2.87k | £1.57k | £2.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/12/2001 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT ("THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Hampstead Way
London
NW11 7LH
- Phone:
- 07831553760
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window