PLATFORM FOR PERFORMANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 19 February 2004: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 20 February 2006 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 06 April 2006 | 65 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JUNE AS AMENDED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING DATED 10 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, AND ALL OTHER ARTS RELATING TO THE PERFORMANCE AND PRESENTATION THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY IN THE TEIGNBRIDGE AND SOUTH DEVON AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window