THE WHALEY BRIDGE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exists to advance education and to relieve people living in Whaley Bridge and surrounding area who are in need because of their social and/or economic circumstances by the provision of a drop-in centre offering facilities and services calculated to relieve such charitable needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,300 from 3 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Lindsay Thomas | Chair | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jane Gregson | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Hall | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David George Shaw | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Gibson | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Knight | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Spencer | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marian Joan Parker | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
EVELYN SHEILA ROSELYN WALTON | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MCCABE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYN ROWLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anne Leyland | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET O'DONOGHUE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.38k | £26.76k | £28.28k | £46.73k | £34.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.39k | £12.44k | £21.47k | £33.98k | £30.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.17k | £8.50k | £500 | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE WHALEY BRIDGE COMMUNITY TRUST IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE PEOPLE LIVING IN WHALEY BRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF A DROP-IN CENTRE OFFERING FACILITIES AND SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE SUCH CHARITABLE NEEDS.
Area of benefit
WHALEY BRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Whaley Lane
Whaley Bridge
High Peak
SK23 7BA
- Phone:
- 01663733454
- Email:
- nye.rowlands@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
whaleyfootsteps.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window