MID DEVON ALLIANCE FOR SPECIAL CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide of a range of out of school activities for children betwen 11 - 19 years who have special needs including physical disability. We currently provide a twice monthly Saturday Club. Our aim is to give each child an opportunity for self-development in a happy and safe environment whilst providing respite for parents, carers and siblings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 09 September 2002: Standard registration
- MASC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Felicity Jean Wilkins | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ana Collier | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gill | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.70k | £3.22k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.96k | £4.09k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS WHO LIVE WITHIN THE MID DEVON DISTRICT BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES INFORMATION AND TRAINING COURSES TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, DISABILITY, DISABILITY OR MEANS; B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS;
Area of benefit
MID DEVON DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Petroc
Bolham Road
TIVERTON
EX16 6SH
- Phone:
- 07866483593
- Email:
- wilkins.5@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window