Financial history THE WHITE ROSE CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 1110935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £7.94k £5.35k £3.43k £8.48k £11.02k
Total expenditure £7.17k £3.76k £4.19k £6.91k £7.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A