CHRIST THE ROCK MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ the Rock Ministries aim is to make its members the members of a community of peoples, the Christian church. In doing so we focus on 1) Promoting the gospel 2) Relief of the poor and 3) Christian education. We try to cooperate with other organisations to increase effectiveness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
- India
- Jamaica
Governance
- 05 December 2003: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN HOPE CENTRE (Working name)
- Soul Refresh (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND DAVID PETER FRENCH | Chair | 16 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
Francis Ayodeji Okonkwo | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND DAVID NATHANIEL BROWN | Trustee | 02 November 2003 |
|
|||||
APOSTLE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND SANDRA MITCHELL FRENCH | Trustee | 16 March 2002 |
|
|
||||
DEON MAUREEN THOMPSON | Trustee | 16 March 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.27k | £81.84k | £70.10k | £83.49k | £75.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.96k | £39.65k | £43.68k | £45.08k | £65.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BY-LAWS ADOPTED 16 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND PRINCIPLES AND ORGANISING CHURCHES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES, BROADBAND, E-MAIL, THE INTERNET, TELEVISION, AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA THAT IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. (2) THE WORLD-WIDE RELIEF F PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. (3) THE WORLD-WIDE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR BY ORGANISED CHURCHES AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS OR BIBLE SCHOOLS) FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Sevington Park
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME15 9SB
- Phone:
- 01622920812
- Email:
- david.french@ctrm.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window