WAKEFIELD VISUALLY IMPAIRED GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide general charitable assistance, support and advice to people of all ages with visual impairments of varying degrees. This currently includes social and educational activities, resources and access to facilities, buildings and open spaces. We also signpost members to other organisations as and when further assistance is required to be dealt with by professional bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 11 September 2002: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £3.60k | £667 | £854 | £699 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.77k | £2.58k | £1.69k | £808 | £623 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 16 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 2001 AS MENDED 10 JUNE 2002 AND 2 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND, VISUALLY IMPAIRED OR HAVE LITERACY PROBLEMS AND ARE IN NEED AND RESIDENT IN WAKEFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window