Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MARLOW HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1093450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £88.22k £18.12k £16.09k £16.44k £0
Total expenditure £5.05k £33.45k £6.50k £131.19k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A