LINDEN EDUCATION LINK (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Linden Education Link (UK) assist in the education of primary school children in the Linden, Region 10, Guyana by providing or assisting in the provision of items, facilities, equipment or other resources. Our funds are raised through, members subscription, donations of money and equipment by members of public and corporate bodies, social events such as dances, garden parties and sponsored walks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2015
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
- Guyana
Governance
- 31 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALTHIA GOODLUCK | Chair | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL MONTOUTH | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND FORTUNE | Trustee | 27 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
AUBREY MONTOUTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE FRASER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE ANN REID RMN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARCIA PARRIS-LEYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WINONA BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL FORTUNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWEN ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.91k | £7.60k | £10.60k | £6.36k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.94k | £6.15k | £11.81k | £6.09k | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 753 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 753 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1118 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1483 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 6 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN LINDEN, GUYANA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT OR OTHER RESOURCES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED OUT OF STATUTORY FUNDING".
Area of benefit
SOUTH AMERICA - GUYANA -LINDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 DARGETS ROAD
CHATHAM
ME5 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01634869887
- Email:
- LINDENLINKUK@VIRGINMEDIA.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window