COUNCIL FOR EDUCATION IN THE COMMONWEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CEC aims to: provide a forum for informed discussion engage in advocacy with UK and Commonwealth Governments influence agendas, discussions and conclusions of the Conferences of Commonwealth Education Ministers and Commonwealth Heads Of Government Meetings. form partnerships within the Commonwealth community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 April 2002: Standard registration
- CEC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Twigg | Chair | 30 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lynn Ang | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anja Nielsen | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Mawhinney | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Dorrell | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr The Lady Susan Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Joanna Newman | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|||||
RITA ODUMOSU | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Chris Chang | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil R Kemp OBE | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALBA DE SOUZA | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £3.06k | £2.75k | £3.11k | £3.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.61k | £870 | £748 | £5.22k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED 2ND JULY 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED ARE TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE COMMONWEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR THE DEVELOPING COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH BY: (A) PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT; (B) CONTRIBUTING TO EDUCATIONAL CO-OPERATION AND THE SHARING OF EXPERIENCE AMONG THE GOVERNMENTS AND PEOPLES OF THE COMMONWEALTH AND TO THE FORMULATION, ADOPTION AND REVIEW OF APPROPRIATE MEASURES TO THAT END; AND (C) PROVIDING FOR THESE PURPOSES A FORUM WHERE MEMBERS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM PARLIAMENT AND OTHER INTERESTED PERSONS MAY EXCHANGE INFORMATION AND VIEWS, AND TO OFFER TO KNOWLEDGEABLE AND EXPERIENCED PERSONS FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES A PLATFORM FOR MAKING KNOWN RECENT DEVELOPMENTS, FOR AIRING ISSUE OF CONCERN AND FOR ADVOCACY OF APPROPRIATE ACTION.
Area of benefit
THE COMMONWEALTH AND IN PARTICULAR THE DEVELOPING COUNTRIES OF THE COMMONWEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Civil Service College
25 Queen Annes Gate
LONDON
SW1H 9BU
- Phone:
- 02080699018
- Email:
- secretariat@cecomm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window