Financial history THE TOWNSEND FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1092970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £19.71k £16.79k £16.79k £18.54k £19.35k
Total expenditure £16.67k £9.79k £16.02k £13.28k £15.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A