INNOCENT CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help children and youth in sickness and poverty by the distribution of aid and educational projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
- India
- Pakistan
- Senegal
- Tanzania
- Yemen
Governance
- 27 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abid Riaz | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Naveed Arif Gondal | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shakir Sarfraz Shah | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Imran Ghani | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £802 | £1.18k | £3.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £282 | £62 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 January 2025 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 January 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO REASONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND EQUIPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
109, Cheetham Hill Road
Manchester
M8 8PY
- Phone:
- 03003023010
- Email:
- info@innocentchild.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window