Accounts and annual returns PRIMROSE HILL CRICKET CLUB

Charity number: 1093091
Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 249 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 980 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 980 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1345 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1345 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1710 days